THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. NICHOLAS, SUTTON, SURREY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Nicholas is part of the Southward Diocease of the Church of England. It's acitvities are set out by the Church of England centred on the advancement of religion for the public benefit, promoting the work of the Church of England in the parish of St Nicholas, Sutton in Surrey. The Parocial Church Council promotes the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sutton
Governance
- 03 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST. NICHOLAS PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Snezhana Doncheva | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Veronica Ayres | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Rose Cann | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard John West | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Douglas Kerr | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Richards | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jean Kerr | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeffery Richards | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ANN LARGE | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Cann | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
RITA ANDERSON | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MEGAN RICHARDS | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tricia Squires | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.76k | £101.74k | £160.22k | £110.40k | £100.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.41k | £100.97k | £89.90k | £101.01k | £124.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 ROBIN HOOD LANE
SUTTON
SM1 2RG
- Phone:
- 02086423499
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window