THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, BIGGLESWADE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parochial Church Council (PCC) of the Church of St Andrew, Biggleswade has the responsibility of co-operating with the Vicar, the Reverend Guy Scott, in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish, the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. The PCC is also responsible for the maintenance of the church building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
124 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 02 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF BIGGLESWADE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Dilley | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Giles | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Leeks | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Maynard | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Judith Thatcher | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harriet Shannon | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nettie Van de Weerd | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS PARKER | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Bentley | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Vivienne Gayfer | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Geoffrey Lackey | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Marshall-Jones | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PHILIP RUTT | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Hilary Johnson | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RAYMOND PILGRIM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.73k | £163.59k | £128.97k | £132.54k | £382.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.18k | £181.47k | £124.89k | £145.30k | £379.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Mountbatten Drive
BIGGLESWADE
SG18 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01767316153
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window