Financial history TATTON GARDEN SOCIETY

Charity number: 500606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £53.89k £48.06k £60.16k £0 £0
Total expenditure £49.82k £31.14k £52.06k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A