THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANN, HANGER LANE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In producing their assessment of the benefit to the public provided by the charity, the PCC confirm that they have complied with the duty in Section 4 of the Charities Act 2006 to have due regard to the Charity Commission?s general guidance on public benefit and in particular, the specific guidance on the advancement of religion for the public benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Haringey
Governance
- 15 September 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST ANN'S PCC, SOUTH TOTTENHAM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Ngeri-Wilson | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dallas Joy Windsor | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Issac Sajith | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Jefferies | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leonard Senior | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Mulcare | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Archibald | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraldo Eghan | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Neofytou | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jessica Swift | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Nesta Murray | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
OWEN MORGAN SLOMAN | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
kATHYNE GREENFIELD-BROWN | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
CORLENE BAIRD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ROB HORSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JASMIN ARCHIBALD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.10k | £184.48k | £163.00k | £199.33k | £177.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.70k | £169.86k | £163.55k | £202.87k | £187.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.02k | £5.46k | £3.13k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 August 2024 | 280 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 August 2024 | 280 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. ANNS Church
Avenue Road
LONDON
N15 5JH
- Phone:
- 02082118710
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window