THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES WITH ST PETER ISLINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St James' is a parish church within the Church of England offering worship in the modern Anglican Catholic tradition. It holds Sunday and weekday services, runs a Sunday School and provides pastoral care to parishioners in need. The church and church hall are available to local community and support groups. Specific local and overseas charities are sponsored through fundraising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Islington
Governance
- 11 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST JAMES' ISLINGTON (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Helen Jane Sims-Williams | Chair | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Congreve Jenkyns | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth BATCHELOR | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Falcioni | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Bellamy | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lebs Anafu | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iris Norah Hodge | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Sorensen | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Isabel Nisbet | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kerri Allen | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Roden | Trustee | 14 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.59k | £104.85k | £341.06k | £183.04k | £211.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.20k | £144.83k | £372.41k | £232.56k | £297.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £250 | £2.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parish Office
St James Church Hall
11 Prebend Street
London
N1 8PF
- Phone:
- 02072264108
- Email:
- VICAR@STJAMESISLINGTON.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window