THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS EALING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

20 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Ealing
Governance
- 03 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST BARNABAS PCC, EALING (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sarah Rachel Howard-Jones | Chair | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Andrea Gray | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Nicholas Barnes | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Thomas Hamerton | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dilys Janet Griffiths | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kui Hoi Lo | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HUDSON | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Valerie Anne Aitken | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|||||
John Llywelyn Tracy Newbegin | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Grace Olivia England | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Andrews | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Anna Coleman | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Peter Hart | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Bennett | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Abram Barry Day | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Robert Philip White | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shine Raj | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Robinson | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Coleman | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
FELICITY MATHER | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.41k | £195.59k | £242.43k | £251.14k | £204.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.32k | £185.05k | £211.72k | £217.86k | £231.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.86k | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Barnabas Church
Pitshanger Lane
W5 1QG
- Phone:
- 02089984079
- Email:
- parish.office@barnabites.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window