Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GILES WEST BRIDGFORD
Charity number: 1133840

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Graham Joseph Baker | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Ottway | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Harold Dunford | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Joy Rooke | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joanna Ruth Seabourne | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Che Royce Seabourne | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Poon | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Prentice | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Margaret Battrum | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Leigh Bolt | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon David Ayers | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Harriet Hutchings | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lindsey Voce | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Donald Rhodes | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barry Robert Clarke | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
HILARY ANN WALTERS | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARGARET WHEATON | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Lane | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Barry John Hayman | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jude Hill | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Ferraro | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Martin David Crew | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.