THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN'S CHURCH NORTH KENSINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of: regular public worship; of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation; activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers, youth groups; Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses, small groups, school visits, events and literature distribution; pastoral visits to the sick and bereaved; support to other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £714 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 11 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST HELENS CHURCH, NORTH KENSINGTON (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev STEPHEN DIVALL | Chair | 06 July 2006 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Brown-Edwards | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emrita Popoola | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gifty Ofori | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Wu | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY WELLS | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ONESS WILLIAMS | Trustee | 28 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.46k | £245.02k | £207.09k | £232.10k | £166.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.95k | £198.64k | £159.96k | £181.59k | £133.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £495 | £714 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST HELEN'S CHURCH
ST HELEN'S GARDENS
LONDON
W10 6LP
- Phone:
- 02089687807
- Email:
- info@sthelenschurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window