Accounts and annual returns WIVELISCOMBE AND DISTRICT ROTARY CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1134610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 13 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 13 September 2024 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 10 May 2023 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 11 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 20 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required