Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE, ST ALBANS
Charity number: 1133957

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jodie Lynn Promod | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Paul Tinson | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Kempton | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Esther Maria Buttle | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alexander James Huzzey | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Jean Hackett | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Debra Evans | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ivor Richard Thomas | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Gillespie Clark | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Harold Ellam | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Sutherland Hall | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher William Swain | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Ann CLOUGH | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHARLES KASER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.