THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GOLDERS GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer Christian worship services on a Sunday and various mid-week groups to deepen faith. We serve the community by running a number of other groups during the week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnet
Governance
- 11 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- GOLDERS GREEN PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON HOUGHTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alexis Bwebale | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kamran Bhatti | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Silvia Rodriguez | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shaniv Muttiah | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ifey Onochie | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Francis Thompson | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nehar Bird | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE BROWN | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|||||
ANTONY CHIDI KOHO EZIHUO NWANODI | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARY GRODZINSKI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY GRAHAM RICHMOND NURSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FESTUS NWAGWU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £272.85k | £216.17k | £202.99k | £215.85k | £226.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.31k | £164.26k | £174.01k | £173.45k | £180.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Golders Green Parish Church
West Heath Drive
LONDON
NW11 7QG
- Phone:
- 02084551873
- Email:
- theoffice@gg-pc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window