Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PAUL'S, HOOTON
Charity number: 1134654

Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Roy James Turner | Chair | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
David McCormick | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Muriel Cain | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Revill | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah-Jane Turner | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Helen Byrne | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Thomas Soper | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA LUCILLE DUFFEY | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE CATHERINE SHEEHY | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Wood | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|||||
LYNNE JEAN BERGIN | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
WENDY HOLMES | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR M HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET LOUISE BARNETT | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS G WALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS K HITCHMOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.