THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST VEDAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an Anglican Parish in the City of London, open 9 - 10 hours a weekday and for several hours on Saturday and Sunday to provide a ministry to many thousands of City workers in banking, finance, law, fund management, shopping and elsewhere
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of London
Governance
- 03 February 2010: Standard registration
- ST VEDAST, FOSTER LANE OR ST VEDAST-ALIAS-FOSTER (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES OLLEY | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
John George Hill M.A | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
Victor Funtanares | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Paul Alan Kennedy | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Edwards | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Barbara Harris | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|||||||
Erica Olley | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Alexander Clark | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD BATCHELOR | Trustee | 22 April 2012 |
|
|
||||||
VALERIE ANN JAMES MA, MLITT | Trustee |
|
||||||||
TOM LAWRANCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DR NORMAN WALTER JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.06k | £247.16k | £189.81k | £360.06k | £304.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.34k | £251.26k | £191.06k | £401.30k | £292.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.12k | £17.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Vedast Alias Foster
4 Foster Lane
LONDON
EC2V 6HH
- Phone:
- 02076063998
- Email:
- administrator@vedast.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window