THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE DIVINE, BROOKLANDS, MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching and promotion of Christianity through events and distribution of literature. Taking of religious assemblies in schools.Promoting the mission of the Church through activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups.Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £360 from 1 government contract(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
- Trafford
Governance
- 15 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. JOHN THE DIVINE PCC, BROOKLANDS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard John Sherratt | Chair | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane McMurdo | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Tewnion | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rodney John Tattersall | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James William Merryweather | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ruth Ashton | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Robert Makins | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ernest Wilfred Darlington | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nwabugo Ubochi | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adele Christine Lane | Trustee | 31 July 2016 |
|
|||||
JANET HUNTER | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.94k | £75.28k | £100.69k | £87.39k | £81.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.13k | £74.77k | £66.52k | £66.22k | £97.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.08k | N/A | £360 | £360 | £360 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.23k | £2.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
137 WENDOVER ROAD
MANCHESTER
M23 9JS
- Phone:
- 01619736892
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window