ALL NATIONS BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exist to communicate the christian message and see lives changed as a result of its corporate worship services, prayer gatherings and the christian lifestyle of its members. This is communicated through a dynamic programme of central meetings, small groups and community care activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Merton
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 28 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 15 March 2016: Funds received from 1129990 CROSSROADS LIFECHOICES LTD
- ALL NATIONS CHURCH, LONDON (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBBIE LINTON-GORDON | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
LINDA NEAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev PAUL OGUNYEMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.41k | £182.79k | £224.43k | £196.16k | £187.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.37k | £116.80k | £254.38k | £359.94k | £598.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 March 2024 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 17 March 2024 | 231 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 August 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 August 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 September 2020 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 07 September 2020 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Nations Baptist Church
12 Poynders Road
LONDON
SW4 8NY
- Phone:
- 02086730639
- Email:
- admin@allnationschurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window