THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TAMWORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parish of churches engaged in religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 02 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST EDITHA'S PCC, TAMWORTH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Simon Lythall | Chair | 09 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Desmond Richard Booth | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANN NICHOLLS | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Goldsworthy | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Pratt | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Yvonne Palin | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan William James Newbold | Trustee | 06 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Walker | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Farrell | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick Mulvey | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Leah Denise Sandford | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Raymond Dawson | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Simpson | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ROSE | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Briony Brookman | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN EDWARD COTTERILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ISOBEL CAROLINE GIBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gwen Louise Wilkinson | Trustee |
|
||||||
NEIL MARTIN WILLIAM BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIVIAN ATTWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.02k | £661.37k | £196.84k | £219.25k | £366.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £298.81k | £239.83k | £242.82k | £226.95k | £430.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £593.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £18.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £19.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £29.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £500.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £239.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £4.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parish Office
St Editha's Church
St Editha's Close
Tamworth
Staffordshire
B79 7DA
- Phone:
- 0182768339
- Email:
- admin@parishoftamworth.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window