THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL AND ST MARK, OLD FORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides an opportunity for people to be involved in Christian worship, prayer and religious teaching. The charity also carries out youth work and arranges social and spiritual activities as a practical expression of its faith-based beliefs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 02 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST PAUL AND ST MARK, OLD FORD PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victor Cummings | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Andrews | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew McKay | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lowther-Adamson | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Darius Weithers | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Walters | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev William O'Reilly | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Melanie O'Reilly | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Yewman | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Durham | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tim Murray | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||
ANNE ELIZABETH ZAKIEWICZ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £286.86k | £375.32k | £410.58k | £276.34k | £237.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £332.84k | £307.10k | £424.94k | £287.60k | £234.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Paul Old Ford
St Stephen's Road
London
E3 5JL
- Phone:
- 02089814655
- Email:
- hello@stpauloldford.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window