CREECH ST MICHAEL BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching, teaching; baptism, Communion of the Lord's Supper; evangelism, mission; teaching, encouragement, welcome & inclusion of young people; nurture & growth of Christian disciples; education & training for Christian & community service; pastoral care; supporting & encouraging charitable social action; encouraging & supporting other Christians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 01 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ZION BAPTIST CHURCH (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Andrew Patrick | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Rathika Chinnadurai | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew James Wallace | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Reuben Stuart Willcocks | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|||||
David Mark Fox | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Raymond Law | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Mark Bailey | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Charles Christopher Medlock | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Benjamin Henry David Cavaghan | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Anne Warden | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matt Bradley | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MIG PARTRIDGE | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £282.14k | £226.89k | £215.39k | £251.43k | £282.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.13k | £210.80k | £190.40k | £270.15k | £300.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/04/2009 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2014 as amended on 14 Oct 2019 as amended on 12 Apr 2021 as amended on 25 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Creech St. Michael Baptist Church
Creech St. Michael
Taunton
TA3 5QQ
- Phone:
- 01823443692
- Email:
- office@creechbc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window