THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY & ST JOHN ROTHLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rothley Parish Church offers Christian worship in the Anglican tradition, maintains a village-wide pastoral care role, supports the work of the village school through its governors and direct involvement, maintains teaching and social activities for all age groups, co-operates and works with the other three Christian denominations in the village for the benefit of the whole community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £6,761 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
246 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 28 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ROTHLEY PARISH CHURCH (Working name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROB GLADSTONE | Chair | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Richard Leslie Croker | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Robert Willey | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Clare Clark | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Rouse | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Garnett | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Margaret Gregory Leverment | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Barker | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Sellar Parkinson | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Prince | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WILSON | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|||||
SUSAN PINKUS | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Linda Poole | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROF DAVID JACK WILSON | Trustee | 09 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.76k | £152.53k | £254.45k | £181.80k | £332.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.48k | £172.72k | £178.77k | £212.89k | £214.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.08k | £330 | £1.46k | £4.62k | £6.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH. PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 School Street
Rothley
LEICESTER
LE7 7RA
- Phone:
- 01162302626
- Email:
- welcome@rothleychurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window