Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, KERSAL AND ST ANDREW, CARR CLOUGH

Charity number: 1134832
Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 January 2024 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 January 2024 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 March 2023 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 March 2023 123 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 March 2022 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 March 2022 138 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 January 2021 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 January 2021 86 days late Download Open in new window