Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, KERSAL AND ST ANDREW, CARR CLOUGH
Charity number: 1134832

Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Longden Rev Dr | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Shedlock Rev | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sian Crosby | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Quinn | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Charis Hart | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Ann Shelock | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
TRACY MARION KEHOE | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MARY WALSH | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Val Cope | Trustee | 30 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EILEEN ANNE BOOTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN DYSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHEA WYNNE DARLINGTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID GEORGE HAMILTON MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.