HAND IN HAND NKORANZA GHANA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are sponsoring children at Hand in Hand Nkoranza and helping others in the UK go to Ghana to deliver training programmes for staff in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 April 2010: Standard registration
- HAND IN HAND (NKORANZA, GHANA): FUNDRAISING AND AWARENESS UK (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Peter Thomas Henderson Hatton | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HATTON | Trustee | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
CARMEL HAND | Trustee | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ATTFIELD | Trustee | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
NAOMI OWEREH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.61k | £4.47k | £4.25k | £7.12k | £7.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.83k | £4.00k | £4.67k | £6.56k | £7.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2023 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE NEED FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN GHANA WHO ARE PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY DISABLED 3.2 TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS WITH MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF ILLNESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK, RECREATION AND LEARNING IN GHANA 3.3 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN GHANA.
Area of benefit
GHANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 The Crescent
Sea Mills
BRISTOL
BS9 2JS
- Phone:
- 07964112916
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window