Financial history FRIENDS OF ST. JOSEPH'S SCHOOL, THAME

Charity number: 1135408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £18.15k £14.49k £31.68k £33.65k £50.08k
Total expenditure £13.68k £11.55k £32.33k £27.60k £38.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.00k