Trustees FRIENDS OF ST. JOSEPH'S SCHOOL, THAME
Charity number: 1135408

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gail Victoria Watson | Chair | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Barnaby Weller | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Margetts | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Lynne Cunningham | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynette Alexandra Bretherton | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Catherine Mary MacLennan | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Harvey | Trustee | 19 March 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.