THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS PRESTON ON TEES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All Saints PCC exists to worship God, to make disciples, share the good news of Jesus and to care for those in need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
180 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 04 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS PCC PRESTON ON TEES (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Paul Wakefield | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Margaret Snowden | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Guy Wingate | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Vass | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matt Levinsohn | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Backhouse | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Wheeldon | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Howard | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Honeywell | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA RUSHTON | Trustee | 25 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
HILARY KAREN KILLICK | Trustee | 25 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
DR LUCY ELIZABETH FALCUS MBBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET LOUISE VAUGHAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £365.22k | £275.75k | £261.20k | £264.01k | £299.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £325.17k | £401.47k | £242.56k | £263.71k | £302.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.92k | £6.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church Office
22 Dunottar Avenue
Eaglescliffe
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
Cleveland
TS16 0AB
- Phone:
- 01642 783814
- Email:
- office.allsaints@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window