DORKING AND HORSHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Mission Policy is based on the vision of the Circuit as an enabling force for strategic local mission, wherever possible in partnership with others, to employ and train lay people to work in frontline mission alongside the ordained staff and to deploy resources in areas of the Circuit where we believe mission activities will bear the most fruit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £16,300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

25 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 22 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 22 October 2021: Funds received from 1142339 ST MARTINS METHODIST CHURCH
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GAVIN PATRICK HANCOCKS BTH | Chair | 01 October 2016 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET LAWLEY BEdHons MA | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Teresa Helen Thomson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
John Neville Dale BA Hons | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev DANIEL JAMES BALSDON MA | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Philip Leslie Reeves | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Joyce | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Dennis Wickham | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID GEORGE PITKEATHLY | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deacon SARAH JANE PITKEATHLY | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|||||
FREDRICK WILLIAM KING | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVE RANDELL | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
RHONA ELIZABETH ELLIOTT | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev SUSAN CONROY | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ELLEN STOVES | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Brian Frogley | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MERLE WALKER | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|||||
BRIAN EDWARD MANNERS | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY HALL | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR RON SHAW | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|||||
CAROLYN ALEXANDRA KING | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAY SODRA DUNNING | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR ROB PITT | Trustee | 13 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ERIC PUTLAND HNC P ENG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR LES PRESCOTT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £325.77k | £349.08k | £319.94k | £262.71k | £418.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £334.48k | £361.49k | £439.42k | £433.90k | £492.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £39.02k | £34.66k | £27.83k | £21.04k | £16.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
"DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)"
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 RYECROFT DRIVE
HORSHAM
RH12 2AW
- Phone:
- 01403253915
- Email:
- minister@lrmchorsham.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window