Trustees CAMBRIDGE CYCLING CAMPAIGN
Charity number: 1138098

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gabriel Bienzobas Mauraza | Chair | 17 March 2022 |
|
|||
James Ian Ross Russell | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|||
Sarah Burge | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|||
Paul Froud | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||
Nigel Deakin | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|||
Anthony Painter | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|||
Sarah Whitebread | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|||
Mark Searle | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|||
Susan Anne Edwards | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.