Trustees TABERNACLE BAPTIST CHURCH, PENARTH
Charity number: 1133948

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Redwood | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muda Ayoola | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Buckley | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE BOURNE | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Roberts | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Morse | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Meadows | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Evans | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Llewellyn | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Niblett | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Robertson | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.