NORTH EAST LONDON GYMNASTICS CLUB LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of gymnastics and dance club and coaching for children, young people and adults. The Club operates from a designated facility in Hackney and also provides gymnastics coaching in a number of schools in Hackney and Islington.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hackney
- Islington
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 11 December 2009: Standard registration
- NELGC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Emma Wilgress Coates | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Graham Collins | Trustee | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Elizabeth Mary Dowd | Trustee | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
TRACY HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAMON COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.62k | £168.39k | £227.43k | £229.62k | £262.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £231.25k | £199.92k | £212.29k | £251.90k | £244.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.26k | £27.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 January 2023 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 January 2023 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
3.1.1 TO THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PARTICIPATION IN GYMNASTICS; 3.1.2 THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION; AND 3.1.3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 MILTON GROVE
LONDON
N16 8QY
- Phone:
- 07458305903
- Email:
- gymnastics@nelgc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window