Financial history BLACKWOOD LITTLE THEATRE

Charity number: 500629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £38.16k £16.43k £9.53k £20.96k £46.86k
Total expenditure £28.90k £13.20k £16.05k £27.19k £34.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.23k £14.00k N/A N/A £6.96k