BLACKWOOD LITTLE THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Presentation of live theatre with an emphasis on drama. Encouragement of members of the public of all ages to take part in all aspects of theatrical performance, direction and management. Interaction with other drama societies by way of competition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £6,959 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 05 August 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janine OCallaghan | Chair | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Bennett | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Dobson | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.16k | £16.43k | £9.53k | £20.96k | £46.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.90k | £13.20k | £16.05k | £27.19k | £34.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.23k | £14.00k | N/A | N/A | £6.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 14 May 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/04/1967 AS AMENDED ON 30/06/1971 as amended on 11 Dec 2022 as amended on 11 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY IS TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS, TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS: A) TO PROMOTE PLAYS, DRAMAS, COMEDIES, OPERAS, OPERETTAS AND OTHER DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC WORKS OF EDUCATIVE VALUE. B) TO PURCHASE, ACQUIRE AND OBTAIN INTERESTS IN THE COPYRIGHT OF OR THE RIGHT TO PERFORM OR SHOW ANY SUCH DRAMATIC OR OPERATIC WORKS. C) TO PURCHASE ACQUIRE AND OBTAIN INTERESTS IN THE COPYRIGHT OF OR THE RIGHT TO PERFORM OR SHOW ANY SUCH DRAMATIC OR OPERATIC WORKS. D)TO PURCHASE OR OTHERWISE ACQUIRE PLANT, MACHINERY, FURNITURE, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, SCENERY AND ALL OTHER NECESSARY EFFECTS. E) TO RAISE FUNDS AND INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHATSOEVER BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTION, DONATION AND OTHERWISE; PROVIDED THAT THE SOCIETY SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE ANY PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITIES IN RAISING FUNDS. E) TO DO ALL SUCH THINGS AS SHALL FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
BLACKWOOD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 WOODBINE ROAD
BLACKWOOD
GWENT
NP12 1QJ
- Phone:
- 01495223485
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window