THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW, ROGATE WITH ST PETER, TERWICK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the Gospel of Our Lord Jesus Christ according to the doctrines and practices of the Church of England. The PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the Incumbent, the Revd Edward Doyle, in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church: pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 01 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 12 August 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 12 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1209306 JOINT COUNCIL FOR THE PARISHES OF ROGATE WITH TERW...
- ROGATE AND TERWICK PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.81k | £103.58k | £117.06k | £114.42k | £119.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.43k | £86.42k | £141.23k | £95.52k | £120.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.80k | £8.65k | N/A | £3.60k | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window