CENTRE FOR DEVELOPMENT AND COMMUNITY WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN UK, CEDCOW INTEGRATE AND EMPOWER MIGRANTS ESPECIALLY REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS TO OVERCOME POVERTY, SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND DISADVANTAGES. IN AFRICA, OUR ACTIVITIES FOCUS ON RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES AND PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN AFRICA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Cameroon
- Sierra Leone
- The Gambia
- Uganda
Governance
- 22 January 2010: Standard registration
- CEDCOW-UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE NGUNI EFAPE | Trustee | 30 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
COLUMBUS NDELOA NJUALEM | Trustee | 30 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
EBUCHE ESUA MICHAEL NKENG | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.30k | £7.30k | £7.30k | £7.30k | £7.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £7.30k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 February 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 21 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION IN LONDON FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY EG REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS AFRICAN MIGRANTS TO THE UK WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED OR DUE TO SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE. 2. TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS."
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 Keymer Avenue
PEACEHAVEN
East Sussex
BN10 8EX
- Phone:
- 07877014819
- Email:
- ndeloa@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window