COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY SERVICES CHESHIRE EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CVS Cheshire Easts aims to understand and respond to the needs of the VCS. It champions change and engagement by nurturing partnerships and collaborative working. It promotes recognition of the value of volunteering and stimulates good practice in volunteer development. It supports and develops strong, sustainable and skilled voluntary and community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £169,220 from 7 government contract(s) and £90,706 from 7 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
Governance
- CVS CHESHIRE EAST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn Hulme | Chair | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
William Lobb | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Pooley | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ijeoma Mba | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Barber | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Cate Green | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Speed | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER BUCKINGHAM | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hills | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £527.39k | £369.94k | £396.15k | £314.44k | £431.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £430.53k | £393.49k | £376.91k | £310.90k | £450.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £213.63k | £12.09k | £16.02k | £120.17k | £169.22k | |
|
Income from government grants | £76.14k | £45.19k | £19.93k | £38.14k | £90.71k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £67.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £355.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £471 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £99.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £430.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE (A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF CHESHIRE EAST BOROUGH COUNCIL AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREIN AFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND, IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; (B) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND INDIVIDUALS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
CHESHIRE EAST
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community & Voluntary Services
Ashton House
1A Gatefield Street
CREWE
CW1 2JP
- Phone:
- 01270763100
- Email:
- enquiries@cvsce.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window