CHASE NC LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objects of the charity are to lease and manage the Chase Neighbourhood Centre, advance education, relieve unemployment in St Ann's Nottingham. To provide facilities for leisure time and recreational activities and to improve the conditions of life for people in the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 26 August 2010: Standard registration
- 30 September 2017: Funds received from 1001926 ST ANN'S ADVICE GROUP
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Folasade Abiodun Sowunmi | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Sheila Jones | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Bird | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev ANTHONY GILES | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|||||
GRANT EVERITT | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.59k | £130.50k | £126.43k | £82.72k | £72.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.98k | £116.80k | £94.42k | £82.12k | £73.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £6.92k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/07/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/07/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ST ANN'S NOTTINGHAM TO 1 TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS, 2. ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT, AND 3 RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EMPLOYMENT ADVICE AND SURGERIES
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE
ROBIN HOOD CHASE
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 4EZ
- Phone:
- 07979159096
- Email:
- info@stannsadvice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window