UXBRIDGE ROAD TABERNACLE REFORMED BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith according to Baptist principles and the Basis of Faith of the church. The holding of public worship services, the conduct of a Sunday School and other activities for children and young people and other activities to the public benefit in promotion of the teaching of the reformed Chrsitian faith in accordance with the Bible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Albania
- India
- Nigeria
- Sri Lanka
- Zambia
Governance
- 23 November 2009: Standard registration
- UXBRIDGE ROAD TABERNACLE (Working name)
- UXBRIDGE ROAD TABERNACLE EVANGELICAL CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL DANSO ASARE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ibrahim Ag Mohamed | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fidelis Chanda | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEN THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM MICHAEL HARBIRD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.27k | £83.91k | £64.66k | £72.21k | £84.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.99k | £74.42k | £78.48k | £74.64k | £110.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/09/2009 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 24/01/2014
Charitable objects
The principal object of the charity is the advancement of the Christian faith according to Baptist principles and in accordance with the Basis of Faith as stated in Schedule 1. The charity may also carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 STEVENTON ROAD
LONDON
W12 0SU
- Phone:
- 02087437770
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window