Financial history LINCOLN METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1134886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £394.11k £682.52k £426.61k £649.27k £396.27k
Total expenditure £484.83k £611.25k £894.17k £395.44k £845.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £587.92k N/A £322.56k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £1.60k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £320.40k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £611.25k N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £395.44k N/A