LINCOLN METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian Faith by regular acts of worship, fellowship groups and pastoral care Outreach into local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

49 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 12 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 01 December 2019: Funds received from 1131196 LINCOLN SOUTH METHODIST CIRCUIT
- LINCOLN NORTH METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
48 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Mottershead | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Willett | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elva Muriel Van de Bos | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wood | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Pilkington | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Faulkner | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Helen Gardner | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Daws | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jennifer Matthews | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Tyreman | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Rushton | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Ridley | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Robinson | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Isherwood | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Juliet Wriglesworth | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Houtby | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Rogalski | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Wills | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ivor McNish | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Swann | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Elaine Johnson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Matthews | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Robinson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Sherlock | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Ryland | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Singleton | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Woolhouse | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Downie | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Swann | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Sissons | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alan Robson | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Nicole Bond | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Margaret Doughty | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pat Bishop | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Walters | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rae Perkins | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Downie | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev TERRY NOWELL | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Scott Prentice | Trustee | 13 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MEASURES | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Philip Harborne | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE FRANCIS OSGODBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jonty Nowell | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE CANHAM BECKETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR David Brown | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA HUTCHINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID VINCENT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £394.11k | £682.52k | £426.61k | £649.27k | £396.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £484.83k | £611.25k | £894.17k | £395.44k | £845.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £587.92k | N/A | £322.56k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £1.60k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £320.40k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £611.25k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £395.44k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 236 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 September 2023 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 September 2023 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 14 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lincoln Methodist Circuit Office
Burton Road Methodist Church
175 Burton Road
Lincoln
LN1 3LW
- Phone:
- 01522 525494
- Email:
- info@lincolnmethodist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window