THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLMER WITH HUNTINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday worship and Services for All ages weekly - Holmer Hub weekly coffee morning - Busy Bees parent and toddler group two sessions weekly - Friday church monthly informal worship and refreshments - Friday club for teenagers fortnightly - Sunday teaching groups for children - baptisms, weddings and funerals - running three church buildings and a church hall for church members and local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 16 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
- HOLMER PCC (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Heather Maxwell | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Maxwell | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Erin Mariah Butler | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gerald William Ridley | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Sheila Elizabeth Tolson | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Edward Jefferis | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Hampshire | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Harris | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gill Waring-Jenkins | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean King | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE PRICE | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
WENDY BURGE | Trustee | 22 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANIS GOUGH | Trustee | 13 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA HARTLAND | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|||||
MARGARET JESSIE LOVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NANCY MARY THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY JANE ROCHARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY CYNTHIA HARTLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.81k | £98.82k | £110.49k | £121.91k | £129.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.86k | £101.86k | £109.54k | £118.70k | £144.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £16.43k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE NEW VICARAGE
HOLMER
HEREFORD
HR4 9RG
- Phone:
- 01432273200
- Email:
- info@holmerchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window