ROYDEN HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The hall is becoming popular for christenings and parties for young children, which has increased our income. Recreational activities continue, with the regular user groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wirral
Governance
- 14 January 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA JANE EDMUNDS | Chair | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Wilson | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALIX COCKCROFT | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEAN PAMELA SEABORNE | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
WENDY MARGARET JONES | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOAN MARY DRAPER | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STEPHEN BARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Malcolm Pembridge | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.30k | £19.66k | £12.19k | £27.00k | £19.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.35k | £15.40k | £12.54k | £21.81k | £16.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.00k | N/A | £3.77k | £250 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 January 2025 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 31ST DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF VILLAGE HALL OR INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS OF FRANKBY AND ADJOINING PARISHES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FRANKBY AND ADJOINING PARISHES
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 The Nook
WIRRAL
Merseyside
CH48 1PH
- Phone:
- 01516779195
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window