Sanibel Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: I) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT WELL-BEING AND POSITIVE MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PSYCHOLOGICAL THERAPY, PSYCHO-EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, COACHING AND ASSISTANCE TO ACCESS EMPLOYMENT, EDUCATION AND TRAINING. II) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND COACHING FOR BOXING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 January 2010: Standard registration
- SANIBEL (Working name)
- SANIBEL PSYCHOLOGICAL THERAPIES (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR A ROSS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James Cooke | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gema Glover | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.47k | £41.39k | £38.19k | £37.25k | £37.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.28k | £65.51k | £68.62k | £105.53k | £130.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/01/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 OCT 2021 as amended on 25 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: I) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT WELL-BEING AND POSITIVE MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PSYCHOLOGICAL THERAPY, PSYCHO-EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, COACHING AND ASSISTANCE TO ACCESS EMPLOYMENT, EDUCATION AND TRAINING. II) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND COACHING FOR BOXING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LILY HOUSE
11 THE SHRUBBERIES
GEORGE LANE
SOUTH WOODFORD
LONDON
E18 1BD
- Phone:
- 02085322371
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window