THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S PRESCOT

Charity number: 1135804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Worship and prayer; Provision of pastoral carefor people living in the parish Missionary and outreach work

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Knowsley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 May 2010: Previously excepted registration
  • 17 September 2021: Funds received from 810361 ANN WAINWRIGHT
  • 20 September 2021: Funds received from 810362 ELIZABETH ATHERTON'S CHARITY FOR THE ORGANIST
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Kimberley Mannings Chair 23 September 2021
PRESCOT CHARITIES FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
ST GABRIEL'S AREA PARTNERSHIP ENABLING PLAY AND LEARNING FOR EVERYONE LTD
Received: On time
THE ENDOWMENT FUND FOR THE SCHOOL AT PRESCOT
Received: On time
FAMILY FRIENDS OF PRESCOT
Recently registered
HUYTON DEANERY
Recently registered
Joyce Lilian Ashley Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
John Alan Berry Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Paul Robert Mason Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
George Richard Smailes Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Bernard Ashley Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
John Eric Orme Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Margaret Anne Bunting Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Joanne Nicola Peers Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Pauline Jessop Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Susan Anne Priestley Trustee 15 July 2021
HUYTON DEANERY
Recently registered
Norine Catherine Jones Trustee 10 July 2021
None on record
Geoffrey Appleton Trustee 14 October 2020
LIVERPOOL CATHEDRAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL CATHEDRAL COMMITTEE
Received: On time
OLIVER LYMES' CHARITY
Received: On time
Steven Martin Trustee 23 April 2019
OLIVER LYMES' CHARITY
Received: On time
Keith James Porter Trustee 23 April 2019
OLIVER LYMES' CHARITY
Received: On time
Barbara Lesley Porter Trustee 23 April 2019
None on record
Eileen Valerie Sugden Trustee 23 April 2019
None on record
CANON GEOFFREY ALMOND Trustee
ST HELENS CARERS CENTRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £167.80k £131.67k £154.71k £92.74k £500.48k
Total expenditure £299.79k £267.45k £254.66k £198.12k £227.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.33k £24.98k N/A £500
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £449.91k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £13.66k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £32.03k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.88k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £365.76k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £227.60k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.40k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £373.08k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £495.20k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £23.68k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Prescot Parish Church Office
Church Street
PRESCOT
Merseyside
L34 3LA
Phone:
01514266719