Accounts and annual returns SOUTH FARNHAM INFANTS PARENT ANDTEACHER ASSOCIATION (SFIPTA)

Charity Number: 1134203
Charity reporting is up to date (191 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 October 2024 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 07 January 2025 191 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 November 2019 On Time Download Open in new window