SOUTH FARNHAM INFANTS PARENT ANDTEACHER ASSOCIATION (SFIPTA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a PTA raising money for the school. We raise money by holding fund-raising events that are targeted to appeal to the parents, staff and pupils of the School and so bring them together and enhance their relationships. This year the events included Party in the Playground, Christmas Fair, Quiz Night, Film Club, Summer Ball, Spring Trail, used uniform sales and Summer Fun.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 08 February 2010: Standard registration
- BSPTA (Working name)
- THE BOURNE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Esther Amy Franks | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Stirton | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Havelock | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.91k | £18.60k | £14.04k | £27.43k | £35.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.74k | £28.86k | £44.09k | £11.06k | £35.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 October 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 January 2025 | 191 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/10/2009 AS AMENDED ON 28/06/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Farnham School
School Lane
Lower Bourne
Farnham
GU10 3PE
- Phone:
- 01252716398
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window