THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN'S, BARBOURNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation Pastoral work, including visiting sick and bereaved Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses + small groups Taking of religious assemblies in schools Promoting the whole mission of the Church through activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 27 July 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST STEPHENS COE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Lindsey Joanne Coulthard | Chair | 04 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Mark Poppleton | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Patrica Kendall | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Drewry Holdsworth | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Courtney Harwood | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Anwyl-Hughes | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Stephen Maltby | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Margaret Niccolls | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Gething | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Janice Scotson | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Amos | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL STANLEY WAKE | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|||||
MARGARET MANDRELL | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|||||
BERYL THORP | Trustee | 25 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HEMMINGS | Trustee | 25 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL KENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.04k | £101.17k | £101.17k | £149.98k | £149.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.71k | £98.34k | £98.33k | £134.12k | £134.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORM CHURCH ACTS OF PARLIAMENT (1971 AND 1982) AND THE SCHEME OF UNION (1972)
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 WHINFIELD ROAD
WORCESTER
WR3 7HF
- Phone:
- 01905451142
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window