THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY SWISS COTTAGE, HAMPSTEAD

Charity number: 1133908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP OPEN TO ALL, PASTORAL WORK, TEACHING OF CHRISTIANITY THROUGH SERMONS, COURSES AND SMALL GROUPS, RELIGIOUS ASSEMBLIES IN SCHOOLS, YOUTH AND CHILDRENS CLUBS WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS, CHURCH MISSIONAL CAFE OUTREACH, THE PROMOTION OF CHRISTIANITY THROUGH THE STAGING OF EVENTS AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF LITERATURE, AND THE SUPPORTING OF OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • CAMDEN POTENTIAL (Working name)
  • HOLY TRINITY SWISS COTTAGE PCC (Working name)
  • THE LIGHTHOUSE LONDON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV ANDREW KENNETH KEIGHLEY LLB HONS Chair
None on record
Christian Tchatchouang Zim Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Andrew Charles Layton Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Siji Adesemowo Trustee 07 May 2023
THE LIGHTHOUSE LONDON COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
Carolyn Longton Trustee 07 May 2023
RESURGO TRUST
Received: On time
Ivy Wanjiku Dakouri Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
Rev Christopher Stewart Trustee 02 July 2022
None on record
Katherine Joy Renna Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Michelle Dunn Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
OLUWATOYIN Taiwo Trustee 13 July 2021
None on record
Elias Costalas Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
Mohyin Costalas Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
Steven Sserunkuma Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record
Michael Sookias Trustee 22 October 2013
None on record
Dr MINABELEMA BAJOMO Trustee
None on record
EMMANUEL OBAFEMI BAJOMO Trustee
None on record
ANIL CHANDER KHERA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £586.01k £1.25m £902.77k £585.01k £1.26m
Total expenditure £659.80k £1.36m £677.40k £661.59k £661.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £545.40k £1.23m £872.84k £553.66k £1.21m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £40.49k £14.62k £17.15k £28.87k £29.95k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £113 £49 £1 £1.81k £18.00k
Income - Other £0 £771 £12.78k £671 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £659.80k £1.36m £677.40k £661.59k £661.82k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.60k £7.20k £8.21k £4.61k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £15.23k £18.88k £19.47k £21.27k £20.08k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £34.07k £70.85k £45.78k £26.40k £21.91k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £240.03k £111.09k £279.87k £318.42k £840.15k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £77.79k £97.46k £15.79k £111.56k £30.75k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HOLY TRINITY C OF E CHURCH
FINCHLEY ROAD
LONDON
NW3 5HT
Phone:
02074350083
Website:

lighthouselondon.org