Accounts and annual returns COMMON SENSE

Charity number: 1136981
Charity reporting is overdue by 994 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 263 days
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 263 days
Annual return 01 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 629 days
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 629 days
Annual return 01 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 994 days
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 994 days
Annual return 01 November 2020 11 October 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2019 12 October 2020 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2019 Not Required