South West Peninsula Methodist District

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the mission of God in the South West Peninsula District by providing churches and circuits with strategic resources, finance, personnel and expertise, and by supporting them in the deployment and oversight of the various ministries of the church, in programmes of training, and by providing opportunities for them to work together and support each other.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Isles Of Scilly
- Plymouth City
- Somerset
- Torbay
Governance
- 12 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PLYMOUTH AND EXETER METHODIST DISTRICT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Daniel Richard Haylett | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev David Clive Miller | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Deacon Ruth Mary Richey | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Janet Elizabeth Park | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Simon John Clarke | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Patrick Stephen Reynolds | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Iris Ruth Bray | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev DEBORAH MARY KIRK | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Sharon Ann Hurlow | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Marianne Patricia Barrett Rogers | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ms Jane Allin | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev KEVIN PETER HOOKE | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £341.38k | £342.66k | £359.11k | £415.70k | £380.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £273.19k | £328.75k | £205.80k | £315.03k | £298.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) as amended on 01 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SWP METHODIST DISTRICT OFFICE
18 Velwell Road
Exeter
Devon
EX4 4LE
- Phone:
- 01392 211624
- Email:
- synodsec@pemd.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window