THE SHEPHERD'S FLOCK INTERNATIONAL CHURCH, UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Shepherd's Flock International Church, United Kingdom is primarily Christian organisation / church providing opportunity for worship within the communities it is located, but more importantly, it is also set up to engage with its local communities through its charitable activities. The Shepherd's Flock International Church, United Kingdom also supports other local charities with same objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 January 2011: Standard registration
- TSFUK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR OLUSEGUN ODUMADE MB,CHB | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tanisha Campbell | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olusoji Sunday Odumade | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr SABO JOSEPH DANKARO MBBS | Trustee | 20 June 2011 |
|
|||||
TOKUNBO OYADAH B.ED | Trustee | 20 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr ISAAC OLUWATOWOJU | Trustee | 12 August 2009 |
|
|
||||
FAITH ODUMADE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/07/2020 | 04/07/2021 | 04/07/2022 | 04/07/2023 | 04/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.62k | £54.08k | £76.93k | £52.20k | £49.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.45k | £12.99k | £48.20k | £40.16k | £46.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 July 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 July 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 July 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 July 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 July 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 July 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 July 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 July 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 July 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 AUGUST 2009 AS AMENDED 12 JUNE 2010 AND 12 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
"TO PRACTICE, TEACH, PREACH AND PROPAGATE CHRISTIANITY AS LAID DOWN IN THE HOLY BIBLE AND TO TAKE THE WHOLE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST TO ALL WHO DO NOT KNOW IT OR WHO HAVE NOT YET RECEIVED IT WHEREVER OPPORTUNITIES MAY BE FOUND.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Shepherd's House
3-5 Briar Way
SKEGNESS
Lincolnshire
PE25 3NR
- Phone:
- 01212706196
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window