WETHERBY ST JAMES CHURCH CENTRE TRUST

Charity Number: 1133514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the charity is to further the religious and other charitable work of the Church of England in the parish of Wetherby. The charity discharges this objective by distributing grants in response to grant applications from third parties. A Grants Committee make recomendations to the trust for each application; the recommendations address eligibility, award and timing of grants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £61,891
Total expenditure: £74,704

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Jenkins Trustee 25 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
Lorna Earle Trustee 25 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
Neil Stobert Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Rev Matthew Peat Trustee 30 November 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
Derek Brown Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Lesley Goodall Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Glynis Hibbert Trustee 27 April 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
Hugh Turner Trustee 27 April 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
Geoffrey Williams Trustee 27 April 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
Hilary Bailey Trustee 16 August 2022
None on record
Stephanie Kemp Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
David Startup Trustee 29 April 2021
None on record
Elaine Kerel Hainsworth Trustee 19 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
Kathryn Wenn Trustee 18 April 2018
None on record
Beatrice Emma Clare Beddoe Trustee 27 April 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
SUSAN DEBORAH TAYLOR Trustee 21 April 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
ALAN GRIMES Trustee 21 June 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
VAL LUMSDEN Trustee 07 May 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
ROBERT JAMES HASKINS Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
WETHERBY ARTS FESTIVAL
Received: On time
JEAN HEATON Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
MARILYN SMITH Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON
Received: On time
DAVID ANDREW BEWELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £56.15k £31.72k £40.35k £56.71k £61.89k
Total expenditure £61.04k £28.01k £41.08k £62.65k £74.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £462 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 March 2023 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 March 2023 134 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. James Church
Church Street
Wetherby
LS22 6LP
Phone:
01937583074